This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 07:28:08 (UTC).

HealthCall of Detroit, Inc. v. Farmers Insurance Exchange

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 HealthCall of Detroit, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Farmers Insurance Exchange. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-12697

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HealthCall of Detroit, Inc.

Defendant

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer K. Green

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

151 S. Old Woodward Ave.Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorneys

Brandy L. Kuretich

Attorney at Hewson & VanHellemont

25900 Greenfield Roadste. 326

Oak Park, MI 48237

Joshua D. Trexler

Attorney at Hewson & Van Hellemont, P.C.

25900 Greenfield Rd.Suite 650

Oak Park, MI 48237

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kuretich, Brandy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brandy L. Kuretich appearing on behalf of Farmers Insurance Exchange (Kuretich, Brandy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua D. Trexler appearing on behalf of Farmers Insurance Exchange (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Farmers Insurance Exchange* (LHos) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit H - Declaration of Joel Szirtes

1 #8

Exhibit G - Bureau of Labor Statistics Report

1 #7

Exhibit F - 2021 Rate Update

1 #6

Exhibit E - 2021 Final Rule

1 #5

Exhibit D - Letter to Farmers Regarding Fee Schedule

1 #3

Exhibit B - Statement of Account

1 #2

Exhibit A - October 21, 2021 EOB

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by HealthCall of Detroit, Inc. against Farmers Insurance Exchange with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8694968 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - October 21, 2021 EOB, #3 Exhibit B - Statement of Account, #4 Exhibit C - Governor Whitmer Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Letter to Farmers Regarding Fee Schedule, #6 Exhibit E - 2021 Final Rule, #7 Exhibit F - 2021 Rate Update, #8 Exhibit G - Bureau of Labor Statistics Report, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Joel Szirtes) (Green, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Farmers Insurance Exchange (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kuretich, Brandy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brandy L. Kuretich appearing on behalf of Farmers Insurance Exchange (Kuretich, Brandy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua D. Trexler appearing on behalf of Farmers Insurance Exchange (Trexler, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Farmers Insurance Exchange* (LHos) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by HealthCall of Detroit, Inc. against Farmers Insurance Exchange with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8694968 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - October 21, 2021 EOB, #3 Exhibit B - Statement of Account, #4 Exhibit C - Governor Whitmer Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Letter to Farmers Regarding Fee Schedule, #6 Exhibit E - 2021 Final Rule, #7 Exhibit F - 2021 Rate Update, #8 Exhibit G - Bureau of Labor Statistics Report, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Joel Szirtes) (Green, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant