This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:56:33 (UTC).

Health Plan of San Joaquin v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Health Plan of San Joaquin filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-46093

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Health Plan of San Joaquin

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Thrifty Payless, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

Valley Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard L. Allen

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1-Attorneys for Plaintiff

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 2-Names of all Defendants

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 3-Brief Description of Cause

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

01/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020 filed on behalf of Health Plan of San Joaquin (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9646628.. Filed by Health Plan of San Joaquin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1-Attorneys for Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 2-Names of all Defendants, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 3-Brief Description of Cause) (Allen, Richard) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less