This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2022 at 08:03:14 (UTC).

Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On February 17, 2022, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company (“HCSC” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Matthew S. Weiler of Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP filed an antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited; Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company; Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC; and others, (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages, restitution and disgorgement for the Defendants’ alleged antitrust violations. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Richard Seeborg and Judge Susan van Keulen presiding. 

In their complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendants, the brand manufacturer of Xyrem and several putative competitors, abused the patent laws by allocating the market for sodium oxybate, a drug that was discovered nearly 150 years. Sodium oxybate, sold under the brand name Xyrem (also known as γ- hydroxybutyric acid (“GHB”)) is a naturally occurring substance found in the central nervous system. Xyrem is manufactured by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc and its affiliates (“Jazz”). Xyrem has historically been Jazz’s main source of revenue, making up 70% or more of its revenues since 2007. Jazz’s growth and profits have been entirely linked to its ability to increase prices on Xyrem and keep the market to itself. To prevent generic competition and unlawfully maintain this monopoly.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Jazz manipulated an FDA safety program meant to mitigate safety risks of certain drugs (“REMS”), engaged in sham patent litigation, abused the REMS process to further frustrate generic competitors and agreed with other Defendants to delay generic entry in exchange for allocating the generic market for AB-rated generic Xyrem. All the while, Jazz imposed a series of gobsmacking price hikes that would not have been possible without its brazen antitrust violations. This scheme caused HCSC to pay inflated prices for Xyrem from July 17, 2017 through the present and continuing until the anticompetitive effects of the Defendants’ unlawful conduct cease. By agreeing to this, Hikma delayed its allegedly impending entry into Jazz’s market over six years until at least July 1, 2023 (i.e., the end of the six-month term for Hikma’s AG). HCSC seeks damages for the overcharges it paid as a result of Defendants’ conduct as well as injunctive relief to prevent the Defendants from continuing their unlawful agreements.”

There are eight claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first five claims alleged deal with conspiracy and combination in restraint of trade under state law because the Plaintiff alleged that there was no legitimate, non-pretextual, pro-competitive business justification for this reverse payment agreement that outweighs its harmful effect on HCSC and competition. The Plaintiff further alleged that even if there were some conceivable and cognizable justification, the payment was not necessary to achieve the purpose. The sixth claim alleged deals with monopolization and Monopolistic Scheme under State Law. The seventh and eighth claims alleged deal with Declaratory and Injunctive relief for violations of section 16 of the Clayton Act, 15 U.S.C. §§ 1-2, 26) and unjust enrichment. 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for an award of HCSC’s overcharge damages, in an amount to be proven and determined at trial and trebled as provided by law; for pre- and post-judgment interest with disgorgement, restitution, and the creation of a constructive trust to remedy Defendants’ unjust enrichment; and an award of all other legal or equitable relief as the Court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00993

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Health Care Service Corporation

Defendants

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.

Hikma Labs, Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC

PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,

Lupin Ltd.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Lupin Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Sinclair Weiler

Jason H. Kim

Todd M. Schneider

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey E. Faucette

Heather Marie Burke

Michael John Shipley

Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw

Brett Johnston Williamson

Stephen Joel McIntyre

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #22 Stipulation re Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/13/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #21 Stipulation re Operative Discovery Agreements. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/13/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#23

(#23) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Discovery purposes. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/2022. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE OPERATIVE DISCOVERY AGREEMENTS filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#18

(#18) Defendants Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Lupin Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Nanomi BV for Lupin Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke on Behalf of Defendants Eurohealth (U.S.A.), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., and Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#8

(#8) Defendant Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,. (Williamson, Brett) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by PAR Pharmaceutical Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,. (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

12 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

04/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) ORDER granting #22 Stipulation re Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/13/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) ORDER granting #21 Stipulation re Operative Discovery Agreements. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/13/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022

DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Discovery. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Discovery purposes. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/2022. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE OPERATIVE DISCOVERY AGREEMENTS filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

Docket(#20) CLERK'S NOTICE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/19/22 is rescheduled to 5/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Defendants Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Lupin Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byLupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Corporate Parent Nanomi BV for Lupin Inc.; Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
03/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke on Behalf of Defendants Eurohealth (U.S.A.), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., and Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Defendant Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byPAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,. (Williamson, Brett) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by PAR Pharmaceutical Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,. (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joel McIntyre (McIntyre, Stephen) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Johnston Williamson (Williamson, Brett) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16917188.). Filed byHealth Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 2/17/2022) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less