This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2021 at 07:47:54 (UTC).

Headley v. Universal Music Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 Headley filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Universal Music Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11120

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. Jawara Headley

Jawara Headley

Brinx Billions

Defendants

Onika Tanya Maraj-Petty

Tokyo Ninja, LLC

Universal Music Group, Inc.

Young Money Entertainment, Inc.

Republic Records, Inc.

Cash Money Records, Inc.

Nicki Minaj

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Lloyd Drummond

Attorney at Drummond & Squillance, PLLC

175-61 Hillside Avenue Ste. 205

Jamaica, NY 11432

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Michael Rosenberg

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard, 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Daniel Joel Aaron

Attorney at Daniel J. Aaron, P.C.

750 Third Ave, Suite 1006

New York, NY 10017

Cynthia S. Arato

Attorney at Shapiro Arato Bach LLP

500 Fifth Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10110

Nicholas Joseph Tardif

Attorney at Universal Music Group, Inc.

1755 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#20

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Cash Money Records, Inc. answer due 3/10/2021; Universal Music Group, Inc. answer due 3/10/2021. (yv) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/26/21) (yv) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Cynthia S. Arato dated February 26, 2021. Document filed by Cash Money Records, Inc., Republic Records, Inc., Universal Music Group, Inc...(Arato, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of Cash Money Records, Inc., Republic Records, Inc., Universal Music Group, Inc...(Arato, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tokyo Ninja, LLC..(Rosenberg, Joshua) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Michael Rosenberg on behalf of Onika Tanya Maraj-Petty, Tokyo Ninja, LLC..(Rosenberg, Joshua) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #19 Motion for Joshua Michael Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/11/2021) (ama) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for Friday, February 19, 2021 is hereby adjourned to Friday, March 19, 2021, at 9:30 A.M. Pre-conference submissions are due no later than Thursday, March 11, 2021. For the conference dial in information and a description of the requirements for the pre-conference submissions, the parties should consult the notice of initial pretrial conference at docket entry 5/ Initial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/11/2021) (cf) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 AMENDED MOTION for Joshua Michael Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED MOTION for Joshua Michael Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Onika Tanya Maraj-Petty, Tokyo Ninja, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Joshua Rosenberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rosenberg, Joshua) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Universal Music Group, Inc. served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. Service was accepted by CT Corporation System as Registered Agent. Document filed by Jawara Headley..(Drummond, Stephen) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on February 19, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 1120. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter as outlined below. This Court encourages plaintiffs to serve defendants promptly. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages by February 11, 2021, addressing the following in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/06/2021) (ama) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cash Money Records, Inc., Onika Tanya Maraj-Petty, Republic Records, Inc., Tokyo Ninja, LLC, Universal Music Group, Inc., Young Money Entertainment, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stephen Lloyd Drummond. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Drummond, Stephen) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Universal Music Group, Inc., Onika Tanya Maraj-Petty, A/K/A Nicki Minaj, Young Money Entertainment, Inc., Cash Money Records, Inc., Republic Records, Inc., and Tokyo Ninja, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jawara Headley..(Drummond, Stephen) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cash Money Records, Inc., Onika Tanya Maraj-Petty, Republic Records, Inc., Tokyo Ninja, LLC, Universal Music Group, Inc., Young Money Entertainment, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23296667)Document filed by Jawara Headley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Drummond, Stephen) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cash Money Records, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Republic Records, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Young Money Entertainment LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant