This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2021 at 07:31:41 (UTC).

HEAD v. SAMPLE et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 HEAD filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against SAMPLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02550

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES HEAD

Cumberland, MD 21501

Defendants

SAMPLE

J. R. BELL

S. EIRICH

K. LILLER

U.S. DEPT OF JUSTICE

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

CLARK

DELARAMA

WILMNER

CANNON

BOOTH

BOCH

 

Court Documents

35 #1

*Restricted*

35 #35

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#34

31 #2

Memorandum in Support

31 #31

Main Document

24 #5

Exhibit 4

24 #3

Exhibit 2

24 #2

Exhibit 1

24 #1

Memorandum in Support

1 #13

Exhibit 11

1 #12

Exhibit 10

1 #11

Exhibit 9

1 #10

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Envelope

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:20-cv-01835. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER Denying #31 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #24 Motion to Dismiss; Transferring case to United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/23/2021. (c/m 9/24/2021 bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/23/2021. (c/m 9/23/2021 bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Assistant Warden Sample, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Officer Boch, Officer Booth, Officer Cannon, Officer Clark, Officer Delarama, Officer K. Liller, Officer Wilmner, U.S. Dept. of Justice.(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Charles Head (Attachments: #1 Envelope Envelope (front and back), #2 Memorandum in Support)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER denying #6 Motion for TRO; denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #15 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #15 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #16 Motion for Leave of the Court to Conduct Limited Discovery ; denying as moot #19 Motion for Request for Service of the Complaint on Defendants. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/8/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-03/09/2021) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 69.20, receipt number 14637126181 (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE re #26 Response to Motion, filed by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Assistant Warden Sample, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Officer Boch, Officer Booth, Officer Cannon, Officer Clark, Officer Delarama, Officer K. Liller, Officer Wilmner, U.S. Dept. of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER directing Plaintiff to identify all unnamed defendants referenced in the complaint within 28 days. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/13/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-07-13-2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time and Other Related Relief by All Mailroom Officers of FCI Cumberland Prison, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, One Unknown Sis Officer of FCI Cumberland, U.S. Dept. of Justice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correspondence from Plaintiff Head re: Needing a copy of complaint(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 40.50, receipt number 14637123637 (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charles Head (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibits)(ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by Charles Head ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/17/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-6/17/2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles Head(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Head(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Mailroom Officers of FCI Cumberland Prison, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, One Unknown Sis Officer of FCI Cumberland, U.S. Dept. of Justice, filed by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sample is a litigant

Latest cases where CANNON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BOOTH Aka CHRISTOPHER BABCOCK BOOTH, CHRISTOPHE B is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK is a litigant