This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2023 at 08:45:24 (UTC).

H&E Equipment Services v. AMES Construction, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 H E Equipment Services filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMES Construction, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00940

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H&E Equipment Services

Defendants

AMES Construction, Inc.

The Travelers Indemnity Company of America

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Loretta G. Mince

Michael Ryan Dodson

Monica Leigh Bergeron

Defendant Attorneys

Raymond C. Lewis

Celeste D. Elliott

Shaundra M. Schudmak

Simon Henry Penning

Christopher R. Teske

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Ex Parte MOTION for Third Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 1/25/2023 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/24/2023)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Ex Parte MOTION for Second Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 1/5/2023 to edit title of document (JEG). (Entered: 01/03/2023)

13 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMES Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lewis, Raymond) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA identifying Affiliate/Interested Person H&E Equipment Services, Affiliate/Interested Person Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Affiliate/Interested Person AMES Construction, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA.. (Teske, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/5/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

1 #9

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Attachment List of Parties

#1

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal and LR 7(a) Certificate. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Ex Parte Motion for Third Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate for good cause shown. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America responsive pleadings due 2/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/25/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 Ex Parte MOTION for Third Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Ex Parte MOTION for Third Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 1/25/2023 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting for good cause shown the #15 Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate, filed by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. Responsive pleadings of Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company of America due 1/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/06/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Second Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Ex Parte MOTION for Second Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 1/5/2023 to edit title of document (JEG). (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a) the #13 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time and LR 7(a) Certificate, filed by Defendant AMES Construction, Inc. AMES Construction, Inc.'s responsive pleadings to the [1-2, pp. 1-9] Petition due 1/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/23/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMES Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lewis, Raymond) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Persons by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA identifying Affiliate/Interested Person H&E Equipment Services, Affiliate/Interested Person Travelers Indemnity Company of America, Affiliate/Interested Person AMES Construction, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, PA.. (Teske, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal and LR 7(a) Certificate. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America identifying Affiliate/Interested Person H&E Equipment Services, Affiliate/Interested Person National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Affiliate/Interested Person AMES Construction, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person The Travelers Indemnity Company of America for The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Elliott, Celeste) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal and LR 7(a) Certificate by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Celeste) Modified on 12/14/2022 to edit title of document (JEG). (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp.,, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company of America.. (Elliott, Celeste) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by AMES Construction, Inc. identifying Affiliate/Interested Person National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A., Affiliate/Interested Person H&E Equipment Services for AMES Construction, Inc... (Lewis, Raymond) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Exhibit(s) to #1 Notice of Removal by AMES Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ames Removal Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Travelers Removal Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent to Removal National Union, #5 Exhibit 5 - Trav Notice of Lien in Velasco Suit, #6 Exhibit 6 - App for Defendants to Pay Costs, #7 Exhibit 7 - Luis Velasco Suit Petitions)(Lewis, Raymond) Modified on 12/7/2022 to remove linkage to document 2 and add linkage to document 1 (JEG). (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/5/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Notice of Removal,. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. (JEG) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-725122 Div 30. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2510988), filed by AMES Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of Parties, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Raymond) Modified on 12/5/2022 to edit State Court information (JEG). (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less