This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2021 at 10:43:23 (UTC).

HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan Roth v. West American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 HDN Condo Association Inc Dan Roth filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against West American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn and Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02232

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

Referral Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan Roth

Defendant

West American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Scott Engle

Attorney at Sharp, Sherman & Engle, LLC

P.O. Box 774968, 401 Lincoln Avenue

Steamboat Springs, CO 80477-4608

Defendant Attorneys

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Jon Milton Ludwig

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#15

#14

#13

3 #8

Summons

3 #6

Complaint

3 #4

Notice of Case Status and Motion for Extension of Time

3 #3

Amended Complaint

3 #2

Affidavit of Service

3 #1

Docket Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E - State Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice to Counsel of Filing

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Return of Service

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan Roth. (Engle, Gary) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Jon Milton Ludwig (Ludwig, Jon) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORDER : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Proposed Scheduling Order due one week prior. At the time of the hearing, parties to call 888-363-4749, Access 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 14, 2021. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#19) ORDER vacating the Scheduling Conference currently set for September 29, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty in light of the case reassignment at ECF 18. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/13/2021. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Routt County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 21-cv-02232-REB-GPG. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/13/21. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and (3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/8/21. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02232-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 September 2021. Pursuant to the form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #14 ), the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant West American Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Ludwig, Jon) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary Scott Engle on behalf of HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan RothAttorney Gary Scott Engle added to party HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan Roth(pty:pla) (Engle, Gary) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon West American Insurance Company on 7/28/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against West American Insurance Company, filed by HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan Roth.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against West American Insurance Company, filed by HDN Condo Association Inc. Dan Roth.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon Milton Ludwig on behalf of West American Insurance CompanyAttorney Jon Milton Ludwig added to party West American Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ludwig, Jon) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant West American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Notice of Case Status and Motion for Extension of Time, #5 Notice of Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute, #6 Complaint, #7 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Holly C. White added to party West American Insurance Company(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West American Insurance Company from Routt County District Court, Case Number 21cv30026. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number BCODC-8026145), filed by West American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Counsel of Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon M. Ludwig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly C. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian John Spano