This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:35:46 (UTC).

HD Silicon Solutions LLC v. Microchip Technology Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 HD Silicon Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Microchip Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08295

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

HD Silicon Solutions LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Microchip Technology Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joseph S. Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Max L. Tribble, Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

P. Ryan Burningham

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Daniel J. Shih

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Daniel Jeffrey Shih

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1201 Third Ave, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101-3000

Paul Ryan Burningham

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brett M. Schuman

Rachel M. Walsh

Brian Christopher Banner

Attorney at Slayden Grubert Beard PLLC

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1650

Austin, TX 78701

Darryl Adams

Attorney at Slayden Grubert Beard PLLC

401 Congress Ave., Ste. 1650, Austin

Austin, TX 78701

Rachel Melissa Walsh

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) Certificate of Interested Entities by HD Silicon Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hongdun Group Inc. for HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#59

(#59) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Shih. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#58

(#58) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16681624.) filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#57

(#57) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to P. Ryan Burningham. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#56

(#56) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number ACANDC-16673485.) filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Burningham, Paul Ryan) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#55

(#55) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HD Silicon Solutions LLC.. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#54

(#54) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Microchip Technology Inc... (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#53

(#53) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/12/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#52

(#52) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit 7 (Patent No. 6,774,033)

1 #7

Exhibit 6 (Patent No. 7,302,619)

1 #6

Exhibit 5 (Patent No. 7,154,299)

1 #5

Exhibit 4 (Patent No. 6,748,577)

1 #4

Exhibit 3 (Patent No. 7,810,002)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 (Patent No. 7,870,404)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 (Patent No. 7,260,731)

1 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#61) CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM: The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2022 will now be held at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk < pRead MoreRead Less

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Certificate of Interested Entities by HD Silicon Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hongdun Group Inc. for HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Shih. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16681624.) filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to P. Ryan Burningham. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number ACANDC-16673485.) filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Burningham, Paul Ryan) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HD Silicon Solutions LLC.. (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Microchip Technology Inc... (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/12/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. Microchip Technology Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Max L. Tribble, Jr (Daniel Shih's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14230625) by on behalf of HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Microchip Technology Inc.. (am) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/30/2020) (am). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 (part 1), #2 AO 120 (part 2))(Tribble, Max) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/30/2020) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/30/2020) (am). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14229265), filed by HD Silicon Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (Patent No. 7,260,731), #3 Exhibit 2 (Patent No. 7,870,404), #4 Exhibit 3 (Patent No. 7,810,002), #5 Exhibit 4 (Patent No. 6,748,577), #6 Exhibit 5 (Patent No. 7,154,299), #7 Exhibit 6 (Patent No. 7,302,619), #8 Exhibit 7 (Patent No. 6,774,033))(Tribble, Max) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICROCHIP TECHNOLOGY INCORPORATED, A Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Christopher Banner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darryl Adams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Melissa Walsh