This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2021 at 17:35:06 (UTC).

HC&B, Inc. v. Avellino Lab USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 HC B, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Avellino Lab USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02422

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HC&B, Inc.

HC&B, Inc. doing business as HCB Health

Defendant

Avellino Lab USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suyash Agrawal

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 E Washington Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Matthew John Reedy

Attorney at Massey & Gail, Llp

50 E Washington, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Timothy Cleveland

Attorney at Cleveland Terrazas

4611 Bee Cave Road, Suite 306B

Austin, TX 78746

Austin Krist

Attorney at Cleveland Terrazas PLLC

4611 Bee Cave Road, Suite 306B

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon Allen Carnes

Attorney at Gozdecki, Del Giudice, Americus, Farkas & Brocato LLP

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60601

Peter J. Huh

Attorney at Gozdecki, Del Giudice, Americus, Farkas & Brocato LLP

One East Wacker, Suite 1700, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeffery Michael Heftman

Attorney at Gozdecki, Del Giudice, Americus, Farkas & Brocato LLP

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/18/2020. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#50

(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to the parties' Agreed Order of Dismissal, joint motion to dismiss without prejudice #49 is granted. Enter Agreed Order of Dismissal. This action is dismissed without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, and with leave to reinstate on or before January 15, 2021, and unless a motion to reinstate is filed by January 15, 2021, the case will be dismissed with prejudice without further order of the Court. The Court clarifies that it will have jurisdiction to enforce the Order of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement until January 15, 2021. See Natkin v. Winfrey, 2015 WL 8484511 (N.D. Ill. Dec. 8, 2015); see Lynch, Inc. v. SamataMason Inc., 279 F.3d 487 (7th Cir. 2002). Unless a motion to reinstate is filed by January 15, 2021, the case will be deemed dismissed with prejudice and the Court will no longer have jurisdiction to enforce the Order of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

49 #1

Proposed Order

#49

(#49) MOTION by Plaintiff HC&B, Inc. to dismiss (JOINT) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krist, Austin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#48

(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' joint motion for a sixth extension of time to responsively plead #46 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond is extended to 9/17/20. The Parties have a settlement in principle, are working to execute settlement documents, and are continuing to engage in good faith settlement activities to attempt to resolve this matter without further expending the resources of either the Parties or the Court.No appearance necessary on 9/15/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#47

(#47) NOTICE of Motion by Brandon Allen Carnes for presentment of extension of time #46 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/15/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#46

(#46) MOTION by Defendant Avellino Lab USA, Inc. for extension of time (The Parties' Joint Motion For a Sixth Extension of Time to Responsively Plead) (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#45

(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' joint motion for a fifth extension of time to responsively plead #43 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond is extended to 9/10/20 in order for parties to work on settlement documents and continue to engage in good faith settlement negotiations. No appearance necessary on 9/3/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#43

(#43) MOTION by Defendant Avellino Lab USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (The Parties' Joint Motion for a Fifth Extension of Time to Responsively Plead) (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HC&B, Inc. as to Avellino Lab USA, Inc. on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HC&B, Inc. by Matthew John Reedy (Reedy, Matthew) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HC&B, Inc. re complaint #1 (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HC&B, Inc. by Suyash Agrawal (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HC&B, Inc. re complaint #1 (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed (ec, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/18/2020. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Pursuant to the parties' Agreed Order of Dismissal, joint motion to dismiss without prejudice #49 is granted. Enter Agreed Order of Dismissal. This action is dismissed without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, and with leave to reinstate on or before January 15, 2021, and unless a motion to reinstate is filed by January 15, 2021, the case will be dismissed with prejudice without further order of the Court. The Court clarifies that it will have jurisdiction to enforce the Order of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement until January 15, 2021. See Natkin v. Winfrey, 2015 WL 8484511 (N.D. Ill. Dec. 8, 2015); see Lynch, Inc. v. SamataMason Inc., 279 F.3d 487 (7th Cir. 2002). Unless a motion to reinstate is filed by January 15, 2021, the case will be deemed dismissed with prejudice and the Court will no longer have jurisdiction to enforce the Order of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION by Plaintiff HC&B, Inc. to dismiss (JOINT) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krist, Austin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' joint motion for a sixth extension of time to responsively plead #46 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond is extended to 9/17/20. The Parties have a settlement in principle, are working to execute settlement documents, and are continuing to engage in good faith settlement activities to attempt to resolve this matter without further expending the resources of either the Parties or the Court.No appearance necessary on 9/15/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Motion by Brandon Allen Carnes for presentment of extension of time #46 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/15/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION by Defendant Avellino Lab USA, Inc. for extension of time (The Parties' Joint Motion For a Sixth Extension of Time to Responsively Plead) (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' joint motion for a fifth extension of time to responsively plead #43 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond is extended to 9/10/20 in order for parties to work on settlement documents and continue to engage in good faith settlement negotiations. No appearance necessary on 9/3/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Motion by Brandon Allen Carnes for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #43 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION by Defendant Avellino Lab USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (The Parties' Joint Motion for a Fifth Extension of Time to Responsively Plead) (Carnes, Brandon) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' joint motion for a forth extension of time to responsively plead #40 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond is extended to 8/31/20 in order for parties to continue good faith settlement negotiations to attempt to resolve this matter without further expending the resources of either the Parties or the Court. No appearance necessary on 9/1/20. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HC&B, Inc. as to Avellino Lab USA, Inc. on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Avellino Lab USA, Inc. (ng, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HC&B, Inc. by Matthew John Reedy (Reedy, Matthew) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HC&B, Inc. re complaint #1 (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HC&B, Inc. by Suyash Agrawal (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by HC&B, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16943023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed (ec, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Allen Carnes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J. Huh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffery Michael Heftman