This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:29:04 (UTC).

(HC) Thomas v. Mitchell

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 HC Thomas filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Mitchell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmund F. Brennan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02442

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Darris Colton Thomas, Jr.

Salina, KS 67402-1606

Respondent

Derenda J. Mitchell

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/9/2019 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the District of Kansas. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

3 #1

Order re Consent

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darris Colton Thomas, Jr. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Derenda J. Mitchell by Darris Colton Thomas, Jr.(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Darris Colton Thomas Jr. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/9/2019 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the District of Kansas. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Darris Colton Thomas Jr.. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darris Colton Thomas, Jr. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Derenda J. Mitchell by Darris Colton Thomas, Jr.(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.