This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:11:17 (UTC).

(HC) Segura v. Lizarraga

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 HC Segura filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lizarraga. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheila K. Oberto and Dale A. Drozd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00990

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheila K. Oberto

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jacob Juarez Segura

Ione, CA 95640

Respondents

Joe A. Lizarraga

Joe A. Lizarraqa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Charity Seraph Whitney

Attorney at California Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721

 

Court Documents

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00990-DAD-SKO.. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charity Seraph Whitney on behalf of Joe A. Lizarraqa. Attorney Whitney, Charity Seraph added. (Whitney, Charity) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

9 #1

Consent Form

#9

(#9) DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Consent / Decline Form served on Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/20/2020. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 9/24/2020. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

7 #1

Consent Form

#7

(#7) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jacob Juarez Segura signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/17/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-04721. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 17, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Juarez Segura. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Memo of P&A

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byJacob Juarez Segura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memo of P&A, #3 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jacob Juarez Segura. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-00990-DAD-SKO.. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitney, Charity) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charity Seraph Whitney on behalf of Joe A. Lizarraqa. Attorney Whitney, Charity Seraph added. (Whitney, Charity) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Consent / Decline Form served on Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Jacob Juarez Segura. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/20/2020. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 9/24/2020. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jacob Juarez Segura. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jacob Juarez Segura signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/17/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-04721. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 17, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Juarez Segura. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacob Juarez Segura, CDCR # AY9177.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byJacob Juarez Segura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memo of P&A, #3 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 7/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less