This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:28:40 (UTC).

(HC) Klippenstein v. Fraunheim

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 HC Klippenstein filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Fraunheim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01705

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Randy Scott Klippenstein

Respondent

Scott Fraunheim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert Joseph Beles

Attorney at Law Offices of Beles & Beles

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 2300

Oakland, CA 94612

Joseph Lanting Ryan

Attorney at Law Offices of Beles & Beles

1 Kaiser Plaza, Suite 2300

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to #3 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Randy Scott Klippenstein. (Beles, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why petition should not be dismissed for failure to meet the statute of limitations signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/11/2019. Show Cause Response due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

2 #1

Order re Consent

#2

(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Scott Fraunheim by Randy Scott Klippenstein. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0972-8606601) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beles, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Ryan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to #3 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Randy Scott Klippenstein. (Beles, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why petition should not be dismissed for failure to meet the statute of limitations signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/11/2019. Show Cause Response due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Scott Fraunheim by Randy Scott Klippenstein. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0972-8606601) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beles, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.