This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:28:48 (UTC).

(HC) Johnson v. People of the State of California

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 HC Johnson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against People of the State of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory G. Hollows and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02439

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory G. Hollows

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Byron Eugene Johnson

Vacaville, CA 95696-2000

Respondent

People of the State of California

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of the State of California by Byron Eugene Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Notice re: CA Supreme Court)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/30/19 DENYING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The clerk of the court is directed to assign a District Judge to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed; and this court decline to issue the certificate of appealability. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #5 by Petitioner Byron Eugene Johnson. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

3 #1

Order re Consent

1 #1

Notice re: CA Supreme Court

#3

(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Byron Eugene Johnson. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #5 by Petitioner Byron Eugene Johnson. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order,, Findings and Recommendations (Motion),, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, served on Byron Eugene Johnson. (Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/30/19 DENYING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The clerk of the court is directed to assign a District Judge to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed; and this court decline to issue the certificate of appealability. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-2439 JAM GGH (HC). (Plummer, M) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Byron Eugene Johnson. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Byron Eugene Johnson. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of the State of California by Byron Eugene Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Notice re: CA Supreme Court)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.