This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 07:06:01 (UTC).

(HC) Fon v. Mayorkas

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 HC Fon filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William V. Gallo and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00295

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stephen Tamufor Fon

Calexico, CA 92231

Respondent

Alejandro Mayorkas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, Sacramento

501 I Street, Suite 10-100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Samuel William Bettwy

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office Southern District of California

880 Front Street, Room 6293

San Diego, CA 92101-8893

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Order Setting Briefing Schedule: Respondent will file and serve a return to the petition on or before 3/29/2021. Petitioner may file a traverse to Respondent's return on or before 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/22/2021.(jrm) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2021. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/18/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#1

(#1) (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Alejandro Mayorkas by Stephen Tamufor Fon.(Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/18/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Upon review of Respondent's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. 6), the Court finds that Respondent has demonstrated good cause for his failure to comply with the previously scheduled deadlines in this habeas action. Accordingly, for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Respondent's request for an extension of time to file a Return to the Petition up to and including April 23, 2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel William Bettwy on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel)Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:res) (jms). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alejandro Mayorkas re 6 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING BEFORE JUDGE BATTAGLIA. Respondent, Alejandro Mayorkas, is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than Friday, April 9, 2021 why Respondent failed to submit a return to the Petition in compliance with the Court's briefing schedule (Doc. No. 5). A hearing on the order to show cause will be scheduled if necessary. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Briefing Schedule: Respondent will file and serve a return to the petition on or before 3/29/2021. Petitioner may file a traverse to Respondent's return on or before 4/29/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/22/2021.(jrm) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of California. (no document attached) (jms) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00171. Original file received electronically (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order served on Stephen Tamufor Fon. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/18/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2021. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/18/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT number #CAE100047654 $5.00 fbo Stephen F Fon by Stephen F Fon on 2/12/2021. (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/18/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Alejandro Mayorkas by Stephen Tamufor Fon.(Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/18/2021.] (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel William Bettwy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey Benison Hemesath