This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:16:25 (UTC).

(HC) Brownlee v. The People of the State of California

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 HC Brownlee filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against The People of the State of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison Claire and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02524

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Benjamin Justin Brownlee

Represa, CA 95671-0066

Respondent

The People of the State of California

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Litigant Letter

#3

(#3) MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against The People of the State of California by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-02524-JAM-AC. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against The People of the State of California by Benjamin Justin Brownlee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.