This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 08:16:37 (UTC).

(HC) Bland v. Warden

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 HC Bland filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher D. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher D. Baker

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joshua Davis Bland

Delano, CA 93216-6000

Respondent

Warden

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden by Joshua Davis Bland. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Helena Barch-Kuchta* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(HBK)* (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Order re Consent

#4

(#4) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Joshua Davis Bland signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 9/14/2022. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Amended Petition Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Dismissing Petition with Leave to File a First Amended Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/04/2022. First Amended Petition due within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition Form)(Maldonado, C) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge Baker, served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #2 Notice of Temporary Magistrate Judge Referral served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Joshua Davis Bland signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 9/14/2022. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Helena Barch-Kuchta* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(HBK)* (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden by Joshua Davis Bland. (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant