Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2021 at 05:39:31 (UTC).

Hazari v. Superior Court of Santa Clara County et al et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Hazari filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Superior Court of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04262

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Claimant

Cyrus Hazari

Saratoga, CA 95070

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Judicial Council

Peter Cassini

Wedgemanor Homeowners Association

Matthew Wendt

Superior Court of Santa Clara County et al

Mandy Brady

D. D. Hughmanick

Messner Reeves, LLP

Anthony Pereira

Appeal Court of the Sixth District

Terra Law LLP

California Supreme Court

13 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Plaintiff's Administration Motion for Disability Accommodation and to File Medical Information Under Seal filed by Cyrus Hazari. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

2 #1

Exhibits to Cross- Cross Complaint

#2

(#2) Cross-Cross Complaint All Defendants filed by Cyrus Hazari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Cross- Cross Complaint)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

1 #3

Filing Free Receipt

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee paid of $ 402.00, receipt # 54611018646). Filed byCyrus Hazari. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Free Receipt)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Plaintiff's Administration Motion for Disability Accommodation and to File Medical Information Under Seal filed by Cyrus Hazari. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Cross-Cross Complaint All Defendants filed by Cyrus Hazari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Cross- Cross Complaint)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee paid of $ 402.00, receipt # 54611018646). Filed byCyrus Hazari. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Free Receipt)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Messner Reeves LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT CLERK OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant