This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:03 (UTC).

HAYWOOD v. ZATECKY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HAYWOOD filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against ZATECKY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04823

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEMAURY HAYWOOD

Pendleton, IN 46064

Respondent

DUSHAN ZATECKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Benjamin Myron Lane Jones

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 West Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by DUSHAN ZATECKY. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 3/6/2020. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Myron Lane Jones on behalf of Respondent DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY - GRANTING MOTION FOR COPIES; Demaury Haywoods motion for copies, dkt. #5 , is granted. The clerk is directed to include copies of the docket sheet and dkt. #3 with Mr. Haywoods copy of this Entry. Mr. Haywood shall have through February 11, 2020, to pay the filing fee as previously directed. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/15/2020. Copies Mailed. (CKM) Modified on 1/15/2020 (CKM). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION Requesting Copies and Notice to the Court, filed by Petitioner DEMAURY HAYWOOD. (MAC) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - (Disciplinary) ; The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Petitioner shall have through January 10, 2020, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/13/2019. Copy Mailed. (CKM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit - disciplinary documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DEMAURY HAYWOOD. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - disciplinary documents)(REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) RECEIPT #IP068267 for Habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (REO) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by DUSHAN ZATECKY. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 3/6/2020. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Myron Lane Jones on behalf of Respondent DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Jones, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY - GRANTING MOTION FOR COPIES; Demaury Haywoods motion for copies, dkt. #5 , is granted. The clerk is directed to include copies of the docket sheet and dkt. #3 with Mr. Haywoods copy of this Entry. Mr. Haywood shall have through February 11, 2020, to pay the filing fee as previously directed. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/15/2020. Copies Mailed. (CKM) Modified on 1/15/2020 (CKM). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Requesting Copies and Notice to the Court, filed by Petitioner DEMAURY HAYWOOD. (MAC) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - (Disciplinary) ; The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Petitioner shall have through January 10, 2020, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/13/2019. Copy Mailed. (CKM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DEMAURY HAYWOOD. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - disciplinary documents)(REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less