This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:25:32 (UTC).

Haywood v. United of Omaha Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Haywood filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United of Omaha Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01195

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donnie Haywood

Defendants

Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC

United of Omaha Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M Pennington

Attorney at PENNINGTON LAW FIRM LLC

1023 Edenton Street

Birmingham, AL 35242

Defendant Attorney

John S Johnson

Attorney at HAND ARENDALL HARRISON SALE LLC

1801 5Th Avenue North, Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by United of Omaha Insurance Company.(Johnson, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(Pennington, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted (not deliverable as addressed unable to forward) by Donnie Haywood as to Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Donnie Haywood. (KAM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(KAM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by United of Omaha Insurance Company.(Johnson, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(Pennington, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted (not deliverable as addressed unable to forward) by Donnie Haywood as to Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3654351 (ALND R# B4601107896) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(KAM). (Pennington, John) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Donnie Haywood. (KAM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(KAM) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less