This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 10:16:23 (UTC).

Haywood v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Haywood filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00384

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnathan Haywood

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Not Classified By Court

SSA (Court Use Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meredith Marcus

Attorney at Daley Disability Law PC

4256 N Ravenswood Ave Ste 104

Chicago, IL 60613

Frederick J Daley, Jr

Attorney at Daley Disability Law PC

4256 N Ravenswood Ave Ste 104

Chicago, IL 60613

Defendant Attorney

Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - Ham/IN

5400 Federal Plz Ste 1500

Hammond, IN 46320

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/29/2020. (cc: USMS)(mrm) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE: Johnathan Haywood was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #8 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. As required by General Order 2020-27, Johnathan Haywood shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone (shk) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Atty Hammond Division, served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (kjp) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/2/2020. (smb) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(mrm) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/29/2020. (cc: USMS)(mrm) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketJudge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE; Motion pending. (jat) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Marcus on behalf of Johnathan Haywood (Marcus, Meredith) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Johnathan Haywood (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Johnathan Haywood. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms (combined))(Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Johnathan Haywood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined)(Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less