This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2021 at 09:39:35 (UTC).

Haywood v. Boehringer Ingelheim (BI) et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Haywood filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim BI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80274

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Haywood

Defendants

Boehringer Ingleheim USA Corporation

Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim (BI)

Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC

Sanofi S.A.

Glaxosmithkline plc.

Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (GSK)

Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Sanofi

Patheon Manufacturing Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas J. Shemik

Attorney at The Dietrich Law Firm P.C.

101 John James Audubon Parkway

Buffalo, NY 14228

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80274-RLR with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Haywood re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, #1 Complaint (Shemik, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14341489, filed by Thomas Haywood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shemik, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi is a litigant

Latest cases where Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant