This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 13:04:47 (UTC).

HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC. v. UPWARD SALES LIMITED et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against UPWARD SALES LIMITED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-11645

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.

Defendants

UPWARD SALES LIMITED

SALTECH LLC

NU COBALT

8STREME

LAMBO PRODUCTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT S. CHRISTIE

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. SALTECH LLC served on 5/29/2001, answer due 6/19/2001. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. 8STREME served on 5/29/2001, answer due 6/19/2001. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 8STREME, LAMBO PRODUCTS INC., NU COBALT, SALTECH LLC, UPWARD SALES LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#3

(#3) AO120 Trademark Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#2

(#2) AO120 Trademark Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 8STREME, LAMBO PRODUCTS INC., NU COBALT, SALTECH LLC, UPWARD SALES LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number CNJDC-12486405) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 05/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. SALTECH LLC served on 5/29/2001, answer due 6/19/2001. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. 8STREME served on 5/29/2001, answer due 6/19/2001. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/2021. (jem) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 8STREME, LAMBO PRODUCTS INC., NU COBALT, SALTECH LLC, UPWARD SALES LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO120 Trademark Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO120 Trademark Form filed. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 8STREME, LAMBO PRODUCTS INC., NU COBALT, SALTECH LLC, UPWARD SALES LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number CNJDC-12486405) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HAYWARD INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(CHRISTIE, SCOTT) (Entered: 05/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hayward Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT S. CHRISTIE