This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:22:12 (UTC).

Hayhurst et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by Hayhurst against Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17163

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amanda Hayhurst

Donnetta Huffman

Defendant

LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS

In Re

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00590. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

9 #1

Request Letter from USDC/DNJ

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the District of New Jersey transferring this action to the USDC/NJ for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/22/2019. (Attachment: #1 Request Letter from USDC/NJ) (cc: attys) (kew) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3), MDL 2904. (kew) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/15/2019 as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002568754. (msa) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Kipnis on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Kipnis, Patricia) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan R. Marshall on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin L. Bailey on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Bailey, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (slr) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7347047. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Member Case Transferred in on 8/23/19 from the Southern District of West Virginia 5:19-cv-00590 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00590. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the District of New Jersey transferring this action to the USDC/NJ for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/22/2019. (Attachment: #1 Request Letter from USDC/NJ) (cc: attys) (kew) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3), MDL 2904. (kew) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/15/2019 as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002568754. (msa) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Kipnis on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Kipnis, Patricia) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan R. Marshall on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Marshall, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin L. Bailey on behalf of Amanda Hayhurst, Donnetta Huffman. (Bailey, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (slr) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7347047. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.