This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 09:09:42 (UTC).

HAYES v. ZATECKY et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 HAYES filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against ZATECKY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02783

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINTERO HAYES

Carlisle, IN 47838

Defendants

D. ZATECKY

D. REAGLE

T. COCHRAN

ASHBY

EVANS

MARTIN

V. SHEPHERD

D. ARNOLD

J. COOK

S. AMBURN

J. STAFFORD

ROSS

GREATHOUSE

HOLLOWELL

VCKOV

JACK HENDRIX

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Submission of Signature Requirement re #15 MOTION for Leave to File by QUINTERO HAYES. (JRB) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

15 #1

Envelope

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through January 10, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (JRT) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

13 #1

Amended Complaint

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Envelope

12 #12

Main Document

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff QUINTERO HAYES. (JRB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by QUINTERO HAYES located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by QUINTERO HAYES to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JRB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by QUINTERO HAYES. (JRB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through December 17, 2021, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against S. AMBURN, D. ARNOLD, ASHBY, T. COCHRAN, J. COOK, EVANS, GREATHOUSE, JACK HENDRIX, HOLLOWELL, MARTIN, D. REAGLE, ROSS, V. SHEPHERD, J. STAFFORD, VCKOV, D. ZATECKY, filed by QUINTERO HAYES. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Submission of Signature Requirement re #15 MOTION for Leave to File by QUINTERO HAYES. (JRB) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff QUINTERO HAYES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(JRB) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through January 10, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (JRT) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff QUINTERO HAYES. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(JRB) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff QUINTERO HAYES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Address updated for QUINTERO HAYES from Pendleton Correctional Facility to Wabash Valley Correctional Facility based on dkt. #9 . (JRT) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff QUINTERO HAYES. (JRB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by QUINTERO HAYES located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by QUINTERO HAYES to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JRB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by QUINTERO HAYES. (JRB) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through December 17, 2021, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***PLEASE DISREGARD -- Docketed in Error*** MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) Modified on 11/3/2021 (DJH). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against S. AMBURN, D. ARNOLD, ASHBY, T. COCHRAN, J. COOK, EVANS, GREATHOUSE, JACK HENDRIX, HOLLOWELL, MARTIN, D. REAGLE, ROSS, V. SHEPHERD, J. STAFFORD, VCKOV, D. ZATECKY, filed by QUINTERO HAYES. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Severing Claims and Directing Issuance of Process signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/1/2021 in Cause No. 1:21-cv-0630-JPH-DML (Document 20). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, the Court severs the remaining claims identified in the screening entry, dkt. 17 #1 . The clerk is directed to open five new civil actions in the Indianapolis Division, consistent with the orders in Part III above.(DJH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ENTRY Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/16/21 in Cause No. 1:21-cv-0630-JPH-DML (Document No. 17). The Court may sever any claim that is misjoined. Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. None of the six claims identified above may proceed in the same action.... No later than August 19, 2021, Mr. Hayes must file a notice stating the following: 1. Mr. Hayes must select one claim (A-F) to pursue in this action. The Court will then issue process on the appropriate defendants. 2. Mr. Hayes may select additional claims (A-F) to pursue in separate actions. The Court will sever those claims and open a new action for each one. In each case, Mr. Hayes will be responsible for either paying the filing fee or obtaining leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will dismiss all claims that Mr. Hayes does not specifically identify in his notice. ***SEE ENTRY.(DJH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASHBY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross is a litigant

Latest cases where EVANS is a litigant

Latest cases where Martin is a litigant