This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2021 at 10:01:31 (UTC).

Hayes v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Hayes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonny Hayes

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

John and Jane Does 1-4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William G. Shields

Attorney at Shields Goodson, PLLC

555 Tombigbee St., Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS MARBLE & HURST, PLLC

P. O. Box 131

Jackson, MS 39205-0131

Rajita Iyer Moss

Attorney at Wells Marble

P.O. Box 131, 300 Concourse Boulevard

Ridgeland, MS 39205-0131

Caroline C. Johnson

Attorney at DANIEL COKER HORTON & BELL

265 North Lamar, Suite R, P.O. Box 1396

Oxford, MS 38655

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/9/2021. (irw)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 10/6/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/7/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/6/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/6/2021. Motions due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/8/2021. (irw)

#11

(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 4/8/2021. (irw)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by William G. Shields on behalf of Sonny Hayes to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Shields, William)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Walmart's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Caroline C. Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Counsel for Plaintiff. (Johnson, Caroline)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; filed in state court, see #7 STATE COURT RECORD (jla) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

7 #9

Plaintiff's NOS - Responses to INT-RFP-RFA

7 #8

Walmart's NOS - 1st INT-RFP-RFA to PL

7 #7

Answer and Defenses of Walmart

7 #6

Summons Return on Walmart

7 #5

Summons issued to Walmart

7 #4

Filing Fee Receipt

7 #3

Complaint

7 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

7 #1

Docket Report

#7

(#7) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Filing Fee Receipt, #5 Summons issued to Walmart, #6 Summons Return on Walmart, #7 Answer and Defenses of Walmart, #8 Walmart's NOS - 1st INT-RFP-RFA to PL, #9 Plaintiff's NOS - Responses to INT-RFP-RFA, #10 Entry of Appearance by Rajita Iyer Moss, #11 Walmart's Notice of Filing NOR) (Moss, Rajita)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/9/2021. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 10/6/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/7/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/6/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/6/2021. Motions due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/8/2021. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 4/8/2021. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by William G. Shields on behalf of Sonny Hayes to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Shields, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Walmart's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Caroline C. Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Counsel for Plaintiff. (Johnson, Caroline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; filed in state court, see #7 STATE COURT RECORD (jla) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Docket Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Filing Fee Receipt, #5 Summons issued to Walmart, #6 Summons Return on Walmart, #7 Answer and Defenses of Walmart, #8 Walmart's NOS - 1st INT-RFP-RFA to PL, #9 Plaintiff's NOS - Responses to INT-RFP-RFA, #10 Entry of Appearance by Rajita Iyer Moss, #11 Walmart's Notice of Filing NOR) (Moss, Rajita)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/11/2021. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE STATEMENT (Disclosure) Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Johnson, Caroline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline C. Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, Caroline)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Filing as to William G. Shields (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sonny Hayes. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Grenada County, Mississippi, case number 2020-298. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1916701) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings, orders served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William G. Shields