This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:24:56 (UTC).

Hayes v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Hayes filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Adams and Kathleen B. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02830

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

Referral Judge

Kathleen B. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hassan Hayes

Defendants

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcia W. Margolius

Attorney at Margolius, Margolius & Associates

1100 Illuminating Bldg., 55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Ruchi Vikram Asher

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland - Social Security

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Social Security Administration - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Local Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/6/19.(S,HR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 #1

Attachment A - Local Rule 16.3.1

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration c/o United States Attorney on 12/9/2019, c/o of Attorney General via Fed-Ex on 12/11/19, and Regional Chief Counsel via Fed-Ex on 12/12/2019 filed on behalf of Hassan Hayes. Related document(s) #7 . (T,Je) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,HR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Local Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/6/19.(S,HR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 12/5/2019. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Hassan Hayes. Related document(s) #1 . (Margolius, Marcia) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Hassan Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Regional Chief Counsel SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 USM-285 US Attorney, #6 USM-285 Attorney General, #7 USM-285 Regional Chief Counsel SSA) (Margolius, Marcia) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.