This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2020 at 12:06:56 (UTC).

Hayes-Pryor et al v. Schwan's Food Service Inc

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Hayes-Pryor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schwan's Food Service Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00593

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Damon Lyles

Rachenda Hayes-Pryor

Defendants

Schwan's Food Service, Inc.

Schwan's Food Service Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Leonard Bauguss, III

Attorney at Ben Abbott & Associates, PLLC

1934 Pendleton Drive

Garland, TX 75041

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel M Karp

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo LLP

13155 Noel Road, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

Austin Bruce Williams

Attorney at Fee Smith Sharp & Vitullo

13155 Noel Rd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 5/4/2021 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Motions due by 2/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/30/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 4/2/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/6/2020) (mla) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Schwan's Food Service Inc.(Karp, Daniel) Modified event on 5/6/2020 (mla). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/23/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schwan's Food Service Inc. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

13 #1

x

13 #16

(#7) Special Orders 13-5 and 13-6 re: Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/16/2020 and 3/18/2020)(lrl) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#4

(#4) NOTICE of filing Index of Pleadings Filed in the State Court Action filed by Schwan's Food Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing List of Involved Attorneys filed by Schwan's Food Service, Inc. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schwan's Food Service, Inc.. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 116th Judicial District, Dallas County, case number DC-20-01959 filed by Schwan's Food Service, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10687597) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Karp, Daniel) Modified Jury Demand on 3/10/2020 (hml). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 5/4/2021 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Motions due by 2/1/2021. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/30/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 4/2/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/6/2020) (mla) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Schwan's Food Service Inc.(Karp, Daniel) Modified event on 5/6/2020 (mla). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/23/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The undersigned orders that all civil and criminal bench and jury trials, in-person court hearings, and sentencing proceedings scheduled to take place through May 1, 2020, are continued due to concerns about COVID-19 and consistent with the Northern District of Texas's Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6, entered by Chief Judge Barbara Lynn on March 13, and March 18, 2020, respectively. In addition, if the attorneys have been ordered to conduct a face-to-face meeting for purposes of preparing a Rule 26(f) Joint Report, an in-person meeting is no longer required. These continuances do not modify any pending deadlines other than the trial or hearing dates mentioned above. Attorneys should file a motion with the Court to modify any other deadlines unless, as is the case in some cases transferred to this Court from other judges, the scheduling order allows the parties to reset deadlines by agreement without Court approval. Due to the Court's reduced ability to obtain an adequate spectrum of jurors, and due to the reduced availability of attorneys and court staff to be present in courtrooms because of the public health considerations associated with COVID-19, the period of the continuances associated with this Order and Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6 are excluded by the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h) and 18 U.S.C. 3161 (h)(7)(A). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by ordering these continuances outweigh the best interests of the public and each defendants right to a speedy trial. In fact, the best interests of the public are served by these continuances. The Court encourages the parties to communicate with opposing counsel and litigants by video or telephone whenever possible. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/19/2020) (lrl) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Special Orders 13-5 and 13-6 re: Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/16/2020 and 3/18/2020)(lrl) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Schwan's Food Service Inc. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of filing Index of Pleadings Filed in the State Court Action filed by Schwan's Food Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of filing List of Involved Attorneys filed by Schwan's Food Service, Inc. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schwan's Food Service, Inc.. (Karp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 116th Judicial District, Dallas County, case number DC-20-01959 filed by Schwan's Food Service, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10687597) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Karp, Daniel) Modified Jury Demand on 3/10/2020 (hml). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel M Karp