This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2020 at 09:44:09 (UTC).

Hayden v. Univar Solutions USA Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Hayden filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Univar Solutions USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-01416

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethan A Hayden

Defendants

Southern States Chemical Inc

Tidewater Transit Co Inc

Univar Solutions USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Elston MacKay

Attorney at MacKay Law Firm

1301 Ella Street

Anderson, SC 29621

Defendant Attorneys

T David Rheney

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

William T Young, III

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. Telephone Conference scheduled for 6/17/20 @ 10:30am. The parties are directed to provide a call in number to Judge Coggins's chambers at coggins_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov by end of business 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/17/20. (alew, ) Modified to edit text on 6/9/2020 (abuc). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/7/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/27/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/25/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/14/2020, Discovery due by 10/14/2020, Motion in Limine due by 12/14/2020, Motions due by 10/28/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/22/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 1/12/2021, Mediation Due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/17/20. (alew, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ethan A Hayden.(MacKay, Raymond) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Union County. (Rheney, T) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Tidewater Transit Co Inc.(Rheney, T) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tidewater Transit Co Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-44-00063. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9050797), filed by Tidewater Transit Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings)(alew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. Telephone Conference scheduled for 6/17/20 @ 10:30am. The parties are directed to provide a call in number to Judge Coggins's chambers at coggins_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov by end of business 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/17/20. (alew, ) Modified to edit text on 6/9/2020 (abuc). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/7/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/27/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/25/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/14/2020, Discovery due by 10/14/2020, Motion in Limine due by 12/14/2020, Motions due by 10/28/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/22/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 1/12/2021, Mediation Due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/17/20. (alew, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ethan A Hayden.(MacKay, Raymond) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel please note: Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (4/28/20). (alew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Union County. (Rheney, T) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Tidewater Transit Co Inc.(Rheney, T) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tidewater Transit Co Inc.(alew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-44-00063. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9050797), filed by Tidewater Transit Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings)(alew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Univar Solutions USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William T Young, III(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T David Rheney