This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:08 (UTC).

Hayden v. Sysco Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Hayden filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sysco Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04745

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leshan Hayden

Defendant

Sysco Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hirsh Julian Frachtman

Attorney at Attorney at Law

3100 Richmond Ave, Ste 203

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/27/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit EEOC Right To Sue Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sysco Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23710189) filed by Leshan Hayden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Right To Sue Letter)(Frachtman, Hirsh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/27/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sysco Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23710189) filed by Leshan Hayden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Right To Sue Letter)(Frachtman, Hirsh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.