This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2022 at 09:44:50 (UTC).

Hayden v. Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Hayden filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00741

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Hayden

Defendants

Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc. doing business as Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc.

Kia Motors America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megen I. Hoffman

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICK BARRY PC

1034 South Brentwood Blvd., Suite 1301

St. Louis, MO 63117

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Patrick Dolan

Attorney at EVANS AND DIXON LLC - St. Louis

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63102

Todd Stanton

Attorney at STANTON BARTON LLC

8000 Maryland Ave., Suite 450

St. Louis, MO 63105

Erin Salfen

Attorney at STANTON BARTON LLC

8000 Maryland Ave., Suite 450

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. ( Motion to Join Parties due by 10/15/2022. Discovery Completion due by 8/15/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2023. ADR Future Reference 4/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2023. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 12/27/2023. Motion in Limine due by 12/27/2023.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 08/05/2022. (KCD) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#14

(#14) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. . (Salfen, Erin) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Salfen, Erin) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc..(Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#11

(#11) RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/4/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/11/2022 02:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on July 18, 2022. (BRP) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Stanton, Todd) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Sean Patrick Dolan for Defendant Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc.. (Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Thomas Hayden.(JBH) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Erin Salfen for Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Salfen, Erin) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Todd Stanton for Defendant Kia America, Inc. . (Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Kia America, Inc. . Parent companies: Kia Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff(Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct event type (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

1 #8

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. ( Motion to Join Parties due by 10/15/2022. Discovery Completion due by 8/15/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2023. ADR Future Reference 4/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2023. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 12/27/2023. Motion in Limine due by 12/27/2023.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 08/05/2022. (KCD) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docket(#15) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Telephone Conference previously scheduled for August 11, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a case management order based upon the parties Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/5/22. (JEB) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.. . (Salfen, Erin) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Salfen, Erin) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc..(Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/4/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/11/2022 02:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on July 18, 2022. (BRP) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Stanton, Todd) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Sean Patrick Dolan for Defendant Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc.. (Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Napleton Mid Rivers Imports, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/24/2022.) (TMT) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Thomas Hayden.(JBH) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Erin Salfen for Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Salfen, Erin) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Todd Stanton for Defendant Kia America, Inc. . (Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Kia America, Inc. . Parent companies: Kia Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff(Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct event type (JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, case number 2211-CC00493, with receipt number AMOEDC-9394450, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Kia America, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Stanton, Todd) Modified on 7/13/2022 to correct docket text(JBH). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Patrick Dolan