This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2020 at 08:56:40 (UTC).

Hayden v. Lincare, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Hayden filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Lincare, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca Grady Jennings. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Hayden

Defendant

Lincare, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kurt A. Scharfenberger

239 S. Fifth Street, Suite 800

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorney

Mark E. Stamelos

Attorney at Ford Harrison LLP

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2010

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/10/2020 granting #5 Motion to Remand. This action is REMANDED to Jefferson Circuit Court, Jefferson County, Kentucky. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (SMJ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Lincare, Inc.. (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Lincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

5 #2

Proposed Order proposed order

5 #1

Exhibit Stipulation

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Mary Hayden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order proposed order) (Scharfenberger, Kurt) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents Lincare Holdings Inc., Linde plc, for Lincare, Inc., by Lincare, Inc. (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

1 #6

Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - declaration of Paula Adams

1 #4

Exhibit D - notice of filing to state court of notice of removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - all state court filings

1 #1

Exhibit A - state court complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincare, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-002367, (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3094869), filed by Lincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #2 Exhibit B - proof of service on defendant of state court complaint, #3 Exhibit C - all state court filings, #4 Exhibit D - notice of filing to state court of notice of removal, #5 Exhibit E - declaration of Paula Adams, #6 Cover Sheet) (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/10/2020 granting #5 Motion to Remand. This action is REMANDED to Jefferson Circuit Court, Jefferson County, Kentucky. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (SMJ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Lincare, Inc.. (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Lincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Mary Hayden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order proposed order) (Scharfenberger, Kurt) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents Lincare Holdings Inc., Linde plc, for Lincare, Inc., by Lincare, Inc. (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincare, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-002367, (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3094869), filed by Lincare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #2 Exhibit B - proof of service on defendant of state court complaint, #3 Exhibit C - all state court filings, #4 Exhibit D - notice of filing to state court of notice of removal, #5 Exhibit E - declaration of Paula Adams, #6 Cover Sheet) (SMJ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less