This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2019 at 08:26:44 (UTC).

Hayati v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Hayati filed an Other lawsuit against National Credit Adjusters, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Campbell Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farokh Hayati

Defendants

National Credit Adjusters, LLC

Trans Union Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samantha Joanne Orlowski

Attorney at Halvorsen Klote

680 Craig Road, Suite 104

St Louis, MO 63141

Defendant Attorney

Justin Kristopher Sauls

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC - Plano

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farokh Hayati. Trans Union Corp. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by Trans Union Corp..(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Farokh Hayati. National Credit Adjusters, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union Corp. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union Corp.. (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Trans Union Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - National Credit)(gsg) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

3 #1

Summons(es) - National Credit

1 #1

Exhibit A - Dispute Letter

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Updated Credit Report

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Trans Union Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7497340.), filed by Farokh Hayati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union Corp. identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union Corp.. (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by Trans Union Corp..(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farokh Hayati. Trans Union Corp. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Trans Union Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - National Credit)(gsg) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Farokh Hayati. National Credit Adjusters, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Farokh Hayati. (ksd ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ksd ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (ksd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Trans Union Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7497340.), filed by Farokh Hayati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Orlowski, Samantha) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.