This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2021 at 11:25:00 (UTC).

Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P. et al v. Hawthorne Airport, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L P filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hawthorne Airport, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10744

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.

Dan Wolfe

Defendants

Levi Stockton

David Wehrly

City of Hawthorne

Hawthorne Airport, LLC

Advanced Air, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ernest J Franceschi, Jr

Attorney at Franceschi Law Corporation

4660 Admiralty Way 5Th Floor

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr.

Attorney at Franceschi Law Corporation

4660 Admiralty Way 5Th Floor

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Brett Cooper

Attorney at Yoffe and Cooper LLP

3713 Highland Avenue Suite 2

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton

Attorney at Yoffe and Cooper LLP

3713 Highland Avenue Suite 2

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Stephen R Hofer

Attorney at Aerlex Law Group

11900 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Stephen Daifun Lee

Attorney at Richards Watson and Gershon

355 South Grand Avenue 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3101

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#2

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Hawthorne answer now due 2/5/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant City of Hawthorne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Stipulation to Extend Time for City of Hawthone's Responsive Pleading)(Attorney Stephen Daifun Lee added to party City of Hawthorne(pty:dft))(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P RULE 12(b)(1), (3), (5), (6), MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P RULE 12(e), AND MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P RULE 12(f) filed by Defendants Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF KIRSTEN STOCKTON, #2 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION, #3 Proposed Order) (Stockton, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen R Hofer counsel for Defendants Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly. Adding Stephen R. Hofer as counsel of record for Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Advanced Air, LLC, David Wehrly, Levi Stockton for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Advanced Air, LLC, David Wehrly, Levi Stockton. (Hofer, Stephen) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly, (Attorney Stephen R Hofer added to party Advanced Air, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Hofer added to party Hawthorne Airport, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Hofer added to party Levi Stockton(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen R Hofer added to party David Wehrly(pty:dft))(Hofer, Stephen) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly, identifying Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Advanced Air, LLC, David Wehrly, Levi Stockton. (Stockton, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton on behalf of Defendants Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly (Stockton, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton on behalf of Defendants Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly (Attorney Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton added to party Advanced Air, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton added to party Hawthorne Airport, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton added to party Levi Stockton(pty:dft), Attorney Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton added to party David Wehrly(pty:dft))(Stockton, Kirsten) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Hawthorne Airport, LLC. (lom) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Advanced Air, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29191842 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaiintiff Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Air, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hawthorne Airport, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest J Franceschi, Jr