This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:48:39 (UTC).

Hawn et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Hawn filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeff Hawn

Jenell Hawn

Defendant

Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bowen Klosinski

Attorney at Klosinski Overstreet, LLP

1229 Augusta West Parkway

Augusta, GA 30909

Defendant Attorney

Allison G. Rhadans

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

1230 Peachtree St. Ne, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Reply to Plaintiff's Response (Doc #11) and in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#11

(#11) Brief in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeff Hawn, Jenell Hawn. (Klosinski, Bowen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. The Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion, the parties shall confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/10/2022. (jlh) Modified on 2/10/2022 (jlh). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting the parties' consent #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Response due on or before Wednesday, 2/16/2022 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/8/2022. (ca) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

7 #2

Exhibit 1

7 #1

Briefs

7 #7

Main Document

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Briefs

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Nationstar Sub 1 LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bowen Klosinski on behalf of Jeff Hawn, Jenell Hawn (Klosinski, Bowen) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record. (maa) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/18/2022. (maa) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave of Absence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/28/2022. (cjc) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC for dates of : 5/6/2022, 5/13/2022, 7/5/2022 - 7/8/2022, 7/11/2022 - 7/12/2022, 8/3/2022-8/5/2022, and 8/8/2022-8/9/2022. (JH) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC for dates of : 5/6/2022, 5/13/2022, 7/5/2022 - 7/8/2022, 7/11/2022 - 7/12/2022, 8/3/2022-8/5/2022, and 8/8/2022-8/9/2022 by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Reply to Plaintiff's Response (Doc #11) and in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Brief in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeff Hawn, Jenell Hawn. (Klosinski, Bowen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. The Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion, the parties shall confer and submit a Rule 26(f) Report within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/10/2022. (jlh) Modified on 2/10/2022 (jlh). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting the parties' consent #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Response due on or before Wednesday, 2/16/2022 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/8/2022. (ca) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (lcw) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. (slt) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Jeff Hawn, Jenell Hawn. Responses due by 2/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klosinski, Bowen) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovey. (JH) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Exhibit 1)(Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovey by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Nationstar Sub 1 LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Rhadans, Allison) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bowen Klosinski on behalf of Jeff Hawn, Jenell Hawn (Klosinski, Bowen) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/28/2022. (maa) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record. (maa) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/18/2022. (maa) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC from Superior Court of Columbia County, case number 2021ECV0516. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGASDC-3265998) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Settlement Communication)(maa) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLISON GIARDINA RHADANS