This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 08:08:04 (UTC).

HAWKINS V. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 HAWKINS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rufus Hawkins

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hughie Duvall Hunt, II

Attorney at KEMET HUNT LAW GROUP, INC

5000 Sunnyside Avenue, Suite 101

Beltsville, MD 20705

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/6/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/5/2020. (Hunt, Hughie) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/06/2020. (Hunt, Hughie) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rufus Hawkins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6960588) filed by Rufus Hawkins.(Hunt, Hughie) Modified on 3/27/2020 to correct receipt number. (ztnr) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/6/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/5/2020. (Hunt, Hughie) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/06/2020. (Hunt, Hughie) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rufus Hawkins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6960588) filed by Rufus Hawkins.(Hunt, Hughie) Modified on 3/27/2020 to correct receipt number. (ztnr) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less