This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:30:00 (UTC).

Hawkins v. Sea Support Ventures, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Hawkins filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Sea Support Ventures, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00661

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willie Hawkins

Defendants

M/V MISS ALINE

Sea Support Ventures, LLC

Miss Aline M/V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M Paul Skrabanek

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek Bruera, PLLC

3701 Kirby Drive, Suite 760

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Jefferson Randolph Tillery

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Justin J. Marocco

Attorney at Jones Walker LLP

Four United Plaza, 8555 United Plaza Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sea Support Ventures, LLC (Tillery, Jefferson) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Miss Aline M/V, Sea Support Ventures, LLC. Attorney Jefferson Randolph Tillery added to party Miss Aline M/V(pty:dft), Attorney Jefferson Randolph Tillery added to party Sea Support Ventures, LLC(pty:dft).(Tillery, Jefferson) Modified text on 5/20/2021 (lt). (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Sea Support Ventures, LLC. (am) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Miss Aline, M/V, Sea Support Ventures, LLC filed by Willie Hawkins.(Skrabanek, M) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (am). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC. 4 FOR CORRECTED FILING**First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against M/V MISS ALINE, Sea Support Ventures, LLC filed by Willie Hawkins.(Skrabanek, M) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (am). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8798433) filed by Willie Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney M Paul Skrabanek added to party Willie Hawkins(pty:pla).(Skrabanek, M) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (am). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sea Support Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin J. Marocco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jefferson R Tillery