This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2021 at 07:28:45 (UTC).

Hawkins v. Gore et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Hawkins filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Gore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill L. Burkhardt and Cynthia Bashant. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Bashant

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Hawkins

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondents

Gore

Xavier Beccera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Attorney General

Attorney at State of California

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101-3702

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Notice of Appeal from Dismissal, by Christopher Hawkins. Nunc pro tunc 5/12/21.(Appeals Clerk indicated not a notice of appeal to the 9th circuit) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: Notice of Appeal from Dismissal, from Petitioner Christopher Hawkins. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case closed per order dated 3/25/2021 (ECF No. 2). Nunc Pro Tunc 5/12/21. Signed by Chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/18/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to submit either the required filing fee or request to proceed in forma pauperis and because the Court must abstain from interference in Petitioners ongoing state criminal proceedings. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/25/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appeal from Dismissal, by Christopher Hawkins. Nunc pro tunc 5/12/21.(Appeals Clerk indicated not a notice of appeal to the 9th circuit) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: Notice of Appeal from Dismissal, from Petitioner Christopher Hawkins. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case closed per order dated 3/25/2021 (ECF No. 2). Nunc Pro Tunc 5/12/21. Signed by Chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/18/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to submit either the required filing fee or request to proceed in forma pauperis and because the Court must abstain from interference in Petitioners ongoing state criminal proceedings. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/25/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Against Gore, Xavier Beccera, filed by Christopher Hawkins. ($5.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-500-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jms)(jrd) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gore is a litigant