This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 07:32:16 (UTC).

Hawkins et al v. Ashford University, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Hawkins filed an Other lawsuit against Ashford University, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda Lopez and Cathy Ann Bencivengo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda Lopez

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephanie Hawkins

Crystal Coursey

Defendants

Doe Individuals

Ashford University, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P. Kristensen

Attorney at Kristensen Weisberg, LLP

12540 Beatrice Street, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Defendant Attorneys

Marshall J. Hogan

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

600 Anton Blvd, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Brian Jay Foster

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

400 East Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Anthony Tom King

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer

400 East Van Buren, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Anthony T. King, re #7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/19/2019. (mdc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brian J. Foster, re #5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/19/2019. (mdc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11920121 - See 18cv2465-AJB-WVG, #10.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (King, Anthony) Modified text on 2/19/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashford University, LLC, as to Ashford University, LLC. (Hogan, Marshall) (anh). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12207211.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Foster, Brian) (mdc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashford University, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Hogan, Marshall) Modified to add Bridgepoint Education, Inc. as corporate parent on 2/19/2019 (anh). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall J. Hogan on behalf of Ashford University, LLC (Hogan, Marshall)Attorney Marshall J. Hogan added to party Ashford University, LLC(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #1

civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ashford University, LLC, Doe Individuals, Stephanie Hawkins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12129789), filed by Crystal Coursey. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-180-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Kristensen, John)(jrm) (sjt). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Anthony T. King, re #7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/19/2019. (mdc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brian J. Foster, re #5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/19/2019. (mdc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11920121 - See 18cv2465-AJB-WVG, #10.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (King, Anthony) Modified text on 2/19/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashford University, LLC, as to Ashford University, LLC. (Hogan, Marshall) (anh). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12207211.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Foster, Brian) (mdc) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashford University, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Hogan, Marshall) Modified to add Bridgepoint Education, Inc. as corporate parent on 2/19/2019 (anh). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall J. Hogan on behalf of Ashford University, LLC (Hogan, Marshall)Attorney Marshall J. Hogan added to party Ashford University, LLC(pty:dft) (anh). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ashford University, LLC, Doe Individuals, Stephanie Hawkins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12129789), filed by Crystal Coursey. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-180-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Kristensen, John)(jrm) (sjt). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashford University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall J. Hogan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Jay Foster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Tom King