This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 08:34:29 (UTC).

Hawk v. Saul

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Hawk filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and S Maurice Hicks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01675

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erica C Hawk

Shreveport, LA 71119

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cristina Walker

Attorney at U S Attorneys Office (SHV)

300 Fannin St Ste 3201

Shreveport, LA 71101-3068

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/30/2019. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding plaintiff's obligations that must be met to obtain a decision from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/13/2020. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding plaintiff's obligations that must be met to obtain a decision from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/13/2020. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/30/2019. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erica C Hawk. (crt,Whidden, C) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #1 Proposed order) (Whidden, C). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Review of a Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision against Andrew Saul filed by Erica C Hawk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.