This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2019 at 07:10:10 (UTC).

Sara Hawes v. AQ Textiles, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Sara Hawes filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against AQ Textiles, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05448

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Hawes

Defendants

Creative Textiles Mills Pvt. Ltd.

AQ Textiles, LLC

Creative Textile Mills Private Limited

Creative Textile Mills Pvt. Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean Clinton Woods

Attorney at Audet and Partners LLP

711 Van Ness Avenue Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

Michael McShane

Attorney at Audet and Partners LLP

711 Van Ness Avenue Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

Charles J LaDuca

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert and LaDuca LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue Nw Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

C Dana Hobart

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Aaron Matthew Levine

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

Jennifer K Van Zant

Attorney at Brooks Pierce Mclendon Humphrey and Leonard LLP

2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

Andrew L Rodenbaugh

Attorney at Brooks Pierce Mclendon Humphrey and Leonard LLP

2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

Ryan C Fairchild

Attorney at Brooks Pierce Mclendon Humphrey and Leonard LLP

2000 Renaissance Plaza, 230 North Elm Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

 

Court Documents

#34

#33

32 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Amended

32 #3

Exhibit C - FTC Letter

32 #2

Exhibit B - FTC Advisory Opinion

32 #1

Exhibit A - Bed sheets purchased by plaintiff

#32

#31

28 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #32 as to Defendant Creative Textile Mills Pvt. Ltd. (iv) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #32 filed by Plaintiff Sara Hawes. (Woods, Sean) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants AQ Textiles, LLC, Creative Textile Mills Pvt. Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sara Hawes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bed sheets purchased by plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - FTC Advisory Opinion, #3 Exhibit C - FTC Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Woods, Sean) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: GRANTING #28 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Fairchild's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC, and designating Charles Dana Hobart as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: GRANTING #27 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer K. Van Zant's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice and designating Charles Dana Hobart as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: The Court GRANTS #26 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew L. Rodenbough's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC, designating Charles Dana Hobart as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Fairchild to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24235593) filed by Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hobart, C.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer K. Van Zant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24235487) filed by Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hobart, C.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew L. Rodenbough to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24235218) filed by Defendant AQ Textiles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hobart, C.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of S. Clinton Woods , Lead Trial Counsel for Plaintiff, RE Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Sara Hawes. (Woods, Sean) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sara Hawes, (Woods, Sean) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Erica C Mirabella. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles E Schaffer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles J LaDuca. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants AQ Textiles, LLC, Creative Textile Mills Private Limited. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sara Hawes. (Woods, Sean) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23966454 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sara Hawes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Sean Clinton Woods added to party Sara Hawes(pty:pla))(Woods, Sean) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creative Textiles Mills Pvt. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Creative Textile Mills Private Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Clinton Woods