This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2022 at 09:03:31 (UTC).

Havrilla et al v. Centene Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 Havrilla filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Centene Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy L. Maldonado. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04126

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy L. Maldonado

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Havrilla

Cynthia Dawson

Alden Henriksen

Melody DeSchepper

Christopher Tilton

Mark Hackett

Defendants

Centene Corporation

Centene Management Company LLC

Celtic Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Steiner

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC

936 N 34Th St Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103

Justin Nicholas Boley

Attorney at Wexler Boley & Elgersma LLP

311 S. Wacker Dr., Ste 5450

Chicago, IL 60606

Beth Ellen Terrell

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC

936 N. 34Th St., Suite 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Jennifer Rust Murray

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC

936 N. 34 St., Suite 300

Seattle, WA 98260

Zoran Tasic

Attorney at Wexler Boley & Elgersma LLP

311 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 5450

Chicago, IL 60606

Kenneth A. Wexler

Attorney at Wexler Boley & Elgersma LLP

311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 5450

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Zoran Tasic (Tasic, Zoran) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Hackett, Alden Henriksen, Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Matthew Havrilla, Christopher Tilton. All Defendants. (Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19783614. (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19783636. (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Jennifer Rust Murray #6 and Beth E. Terrell #7 to appear pro hac vice are granted. (mk) (Entered: 08/27/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19788709. (Steiner, Amanda) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Amanda Steiner to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 10/7/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 10/14/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#12

(#12) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 22-0018: Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on September 9, 2022, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 287 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such case; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Maldonado shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/03/2022.(tg, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 22-0018: Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on September 9, 2022, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 287 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such case; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Maldonado shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/03/2022.(tg, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 10/7/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 10/14/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Amanda Steiner to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19788709. (Steiner, Amanda) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Jennifer Rust Murray #6 and Beth E. Terrell #7 to appear pro hac vice are granted. (mk) (Entered: 08/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19783636. (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19783614. (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Hackett, Alden Henriksen, Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Matthew Havrilla, Christopher Tilton. All Defendants. (Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Celtic Insurance Company, Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company LLC (mbh, ) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Zoran Tasic (Tasic, Zoran) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Justin Nicholas Boley (Boley, Justin) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Mark Hackett, Matthew Havrilla, Alden Henriksen, Christopher Tilton by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Hackett, Alden Henriksen, Cynthia Dawson, Melody DeSchepper, Matthew Havrilla, Christopher Tilton; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19718272. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wexler, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Celtic Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Centene Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zoran Tasic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rust Murray