This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2019 at 07:39:07 (UTC).

Havana Docks Corporation v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 Havana Docks Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-23590

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Havana Docks Corporation

Defendant

Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aziza F Elayan-Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

2 South Biscayne Tower, Ste. 3800

Miami, FL 33131

Rodney Stuart Margol

Attorney at Margol , Margol, PA

2029 North Third Street

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

Roberto Martinez

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2351

Stephanie Anne Casey

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle, Ph

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Zachary Andrew Lipshultz

Attorney at Colson Hicks Eidson

255 Alhambra Circle

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Daniel Ponce

Attorney at Holland & Knight

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

Sanford Lewis Bohrer

Attorney at Holland & Knight

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

19 #3

Exhibit

19 #2

Exhibit

19 #1

Exhibit

#19

(#19) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Havana Docks Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#18

(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 24, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#17

(#17) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#16

(#16) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Andrew Lipshultz on behalf of Havana Docks Corporation. Attorney Zachary Andrew Lipshultz added to party Havana Docks Corporation(pty:pla). (Lipshultz, Zachary) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Havana Docks Corporation of Filing Return of Service (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's REPLY In Support of It's Motion to Transfer by Havana Docks Corporation. (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions and Motion to Transfer by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sanford Lewis Bohrer on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Sanford Lewis Bohrer added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Bohrer, Sanford) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Filing fees $ 6948.00 receipt number 113C-11936567. This amount includes the filing fee of $ 400.00 for Opening a Civil Action and $ 6,548.00 for this Action, filed by Havana Docks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Havana Docks Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 24, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (lk) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Andrew Lipshultz on behalf of Havana Docks Corporation. Attorney Zachary Andrew Lipshultz added to party Havana Docks Corporation(pty:pla). (Lipshultz, Zachary) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Havana Docks Corporation. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. See image at DE #11 (lk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Havana Docks Corporation of Filing Return of Service (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Plaintiff's REPLY In Support of It's Motion to Transfer by Havana Docks Corporation. (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions and Motion to Transfer by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sanford Lewis Bohrer on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Sanford Lewis Bohrer added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Bohrer, Sanford) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint. Defendant shall file a response or answer to the complaint on or before October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/10/2019. (jdo) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996, by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Scott Daniel Ponce added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Ponce, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Havana Docks Corporation (Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/27/2019. (jdo) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (ar2) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Filing fees $ 6948.00 receipt number 113C-11936567. This amount includes the filing fee of $ 400.00 for Opening a Civil Action and $ 6,548.00 for this Action, filed by Havana Docks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Martinez, Roberto) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aziza F Elayan-Martinez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Andrew Lipshultz(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Anne Casey