This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 12:02:05 (UTC).

Wendy Haut v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Wendy Haut filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00237

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy Haut

Defendants

Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael B Horrow

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Scott E Calvert

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Francis J Torrence

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

525 Market Street 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Caroline Grace Beason Massey

Attorney at Horton Oberrecht and Kirkpatrick

655 West Broadway Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#23

(#23) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE [DKT. 21] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, for good cause appearing and pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, hereby dismisses Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN (the Plan) from this case, without prejudice. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#22

(#22) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd) (Entered: 02/12/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order In Support of Stipulation To Dismiss Defendant Cengage Learning,

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-009) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00237-MEMF-PLAx. (vp) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan.(Massey, Caroline) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on March 18, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by March 8, 2022. (jgr) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc as Corporate Parent. (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

4 #1

Summons Cengage

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cengage)(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cengage)(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#1

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Francis J Torrence added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN WITHOUT PREJUDICE [DKT. 21] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, for good cause appearing and pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, hereby dismisses Defendant CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN (the Plan) from this case, without prejudice. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd) (Entered: 02/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION to Dismiss Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order In Support of Stipulation To Dismiss Defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan Without Prejudice)(Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-009) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00237-MEMF-PLAx. (vp) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan.(Massey, Caroline) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on March 18, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by March 8, 2022. (jgr) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc as Corporate Parent. (Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Francis J Torrence added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Torrence, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan, identifying Defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan's sponsor is Cengage Learning, Inc. ("Cengage"). Cengage is not a public company, and thus issues no stock. Cengage is a subsidiary of Cengage Learning Holdco, Inc., which is a subsidiary of Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc. ("CLH II"). KKR Asset Management owns 10% or more of the interest in CLH II. KKR Asset Management is a subsidiary of KKR & Co. L.P., which is publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange. Cengage does not have additional parent, subsidiary, or affiliate entities (corporate or otherwise) that have issued stock or debt securities to the public.. (Massey, Caroline) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut, upon Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 1/14/2022, answer due 2/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Gastelum- C.T. Corp Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cengage)(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut, identifying Wendy Haut, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, Cengage Learning, Inc. Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut. (Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32607487 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Wendy Haut. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Wendy Haut(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Cengage Learning, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis Jude Torrence