This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2020 at 08:46:09 (UTC).

HausHub LLC v. HubHaus Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 HausHub LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against HubHaus Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01162

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAUSHUB LLC

Defendant

HUBHAUS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas A. Brown

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94111-5983

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/2/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HausHub LLC.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by HausHub LLC identifying Other Affiliate George Kokkonas for HausHub LLC. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to HubHaus Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademarks (cc: form mailed to register). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark No. 4827615 (cc: form mailed to register). (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by HAUSHUB LLC (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HubHaus Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14179932.). Filed by HausHub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/2/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/02/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HausHub LLC.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials KAW immediately after the case number. Re: #9 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by HausHub LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by HausHub LLC identifying Other Affiliate George Kokkonas for HausHub LLC. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to HubHaus Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademarks (cc: form mailed to register). (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by HausHub LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark No. 4827615 (cc: form mailed to register). (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by HAUSHUB LLC (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HubHaus Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14179932.). Filed by HausHub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUBHAUS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas A Brown