This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 06:18:22 (UTC).

Hausauer et al v. Fifth Third Bank, National Association et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Hausauer filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Fifth Third Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-80899

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barry W Hausauer

Eventide Ventures, LLC

Defendants

Fifth Third Bank, National Association

Lawrence Ryan

Harold Chmiel

David Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Graff

Attorney at Graff Silverstein LLP

3 Middle Patent Road

Armonk, NY 10504

Barry Phillip Gruher

Attorney at Genovese Joblove & Battista, PA

200 East Broward Blvd., Suite 1110

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos A Garcia

Attorney at Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy Ford, P.A.

515 E. Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1400

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jason A. Glusman

Attorney at Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy & Ford

515 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1400 Suntrust Bank

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER granting in part #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion. Responses due by 9/6/2022 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#21

(#21) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Eventide Ventures, LLC, Barry W Hausauer. (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

20 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Lawrence Ryan

20 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of David Garcia

20 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Harold Chmiel

20 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint

20 #20

Main Document

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#5

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David Graff,. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Graff, mailing date June 21, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Harold Chmiel, Fifth Third Bank, National Association, David Garcia, Lawrence Ryan. (swr) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting in part #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion. Responses due by 9/6/2022 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #20 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Eventide Ventures, LLC, Barry W Hausauer. (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Harold Chmiel, Fifth Third Bank, National Association, David Garcia, Lawrence Ryan. Responses due by 8/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Harold Chmiel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of David Garcia, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Lawrence Ryan)(Garcia, Carlos) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Harold Chmiel. Answer due 8/8/2022; Fifth Third Bank, National Association.Answer due 8/8/2022; David Garcia. Answer due 8/8/2022; Lawrence Ryan. Answer due 8/8/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Harold Chmiel, Fifth Third Bank, National Association, David Garcia, Lawrence Ryan. Attorney Carlos A Garcia added to party Harold Chmiel(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos A Garcia added to party David Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos A Garcia added to party Lawrence Ryan(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garcia, Carlos) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason A. Glusman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Attorney Jason A. Glusman added to party Fifth Third Bank, National Association(pty:dft). (Glusman, Jason) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos A Garcia on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Attorney Carlos A Garcia added to party Fifth Third Bank, National Association(pty:dft). (Garcia, Carlos) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Barry W Hausauer, Eventide Ventures, LLC. David Garcia served on 7/6/2022, response/answer due 7/27/2022. (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Barry W Hausauer, Eventide Ventures, LLC. Harold Chmiel served on 7/5/2022, response/answer due 7/26/2022. (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Barry W Hausauer, Eventide Ventures, LLC. Lawrence Ryan served on 6/30/2022, response/answer due 7/21/2022. (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to Show Cause by Barry W Hausauer, Eventide Ventures, LLC. (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants, filed by Barry W Hausauer, Eventide Ventures, LLC.(Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney David Graff,. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Eventide Ventures, LLC, Barry W Hausauer re #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Graff, Esq.. (Ex-Parte) Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15732422 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Graff, Esq.. (Ex-Parte) Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15732422 by Eventide Ventures, LLC, Barry W Hausauer. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Graff, mailing date June 21, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Harold Chmiel, Fifth Third Bank, National Association, David Garcia, Lawrence Ryan. (swr) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15727179, filed by Barry W Hausauer, Eventide Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Gruher, Barry) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth Third Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos A Garcia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. Glusman