This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2021 at 10:13:35 (UTC).

Haugen v. Activision Publishing, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Haugen filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Activision Publishing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clayton Haugen

Defendants

Infinity Ward, Inc.

Activision Blizzard Inc

Activision Publishing, Inc.

Major League Gaming Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick Zummo

Attorney at Law Offices of Patrick Zummo

Two Houston Center, 909 Fannin, Ste 3500

Houston, TX 77010

Timothy Micah Dortch

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP - Dallas

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Christopher David Lindstrom

Attorney at Potts Law Firm, LLP - Houston

3737 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

7 #3

Summons(es)

7 #2

Summons(es)

7 #1

Summons(es)

#7

#6

#5

1 #2

Attachment

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Infinity Ward, Inc. to 4/12/2021; Activision Blizzard Inc to 4/12/2021; Activision Publishing, Inc. to 4/12/2021; Major League Gaming Corp. to 4/12/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Major League Gaming Corp..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Infinity Ward, Inc. to 3/28/2021; Activision Blizzard Inc to 3/28/2021; Activision Publishing, Inc. to 3/28/2021; Major League Gaming Corp. to 3/28/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Major League Gaming Corp..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Activision Blizzard Inc, Activision Publishing, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Major League Gaming Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Micah Dortch on behalf of Clayton Haugen (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher David Lindstrom on behalf of Clayton Haugen (Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Zummo, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clayton Haugen. (Zummo, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zummo, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8229357.), filed by Clayton Haugen.(Zummo, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment) (ch, ). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAJOR LEAGUE GAMING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Ward, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACTIVISION PUBLISHING INC. is a litigant