This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:54:18 (UTC).

Hatton v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Hatton filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas R. Cole and Sharon L. Ovington. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

Referral Judge

Sharon L. Ovington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Hatton

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Rake

Attorney at Horenstein, Nicholson & Blumenthal - 3

124 East Third Street, 5Th Floor

Dayton, OH 45402

Defendant Attorneys

John J. Stark

Attorney at US Attorney Office

303 Marconi Boulevard, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Shefali Baltz

Attorney at Social Security Administration

200 W Adams, 30Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Baltz, Shefali) Modified attorney role on 1/23/2020 (rp). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/16/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, Assistant U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of General Counsel (jmb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer Hatton. (jmb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 1/7/2020. (lk) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Hatton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.