This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 08:02:20 (UTC).

HATSTAT v. STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 HATSTAT filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELLYN HATSTAT

ANDREW HATSTAT

Defendants

STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK R. STRAUSS

1661 Bethlehem Pike `

Hatfield, PA 19440

Defendant Attorneys

JEREMY M SUHR

Attorney at Boulware Law LLC

1600 Genessee, Suite 416

Kansas City, MO 64102

BRANDON J.B. BOULWARE

Attorney at Boulware Law LLC

1600 Genessee Street, Suite 416

Kansas City, MO 64102

BASIL A. DISIPIO

Attorney at LAVIN, CEDRONE, GRAVER, BOYD & DISIPIO

190 N. Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy M. Suhr, Esq. by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15680793.). (DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandon J.B. Boulware by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC... (DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting BRANDON J.B BOULWARE'S APPLICATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/24/22. 1/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JEREMY M. SUHR, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/24/22. 1/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/6/2022 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/6/2022 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCopy of Doc. 9 mailed to Counsel. (mas) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JEREMY M. SUHR, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/24/22. 1/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting BRANDON J.B BOULWARE'S APPLICATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/24/22. 1/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandon J.B. Boulware by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC... (DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy M. Suhr, Esq. by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15680793.). (DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC..(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15661719), filed by STAMINA PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy M. Suhr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Basil A Disipio