This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2019 at 07:36:39 (UTC).

Hathaway v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Hathaway filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar, Steven C. Yarbrough and Kenneth J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00862

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Presiding Judges

Steven C. Yarbrough

Kenneth J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Hathaway

Defendants

Allstate Insurance Company

Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael G. Solon

Attorney at Rios Law Firm

Post Office Box 3398

Albuquerque, NM 87190-3398

Linda J Rios

Attorney at Rios Law Firm

Po Box 3398

Albuquerque, NM 87190

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth G. Perkins

Attorney at Chapman & Priest, PC

Po Box 87199

Albuquerque, NM 87199

Stephen Simone

Attorney at Chapman and Priest, P.C.

4100 Osuna Ne, Suite 2-202

Albuquerque, NM 87109

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT AND TELEPHONIC PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 1:00 PM. The parties are to call the AT&T Teleconference line: 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. The parties' settlement letters are due 2/6/2020, 2/13/2020, and 2/19/2020, as set forth in the attached order. (smd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call the AT&T Teleconference line: 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2019. Defendants' Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due 1/31/2020. Defendants' Expert Disclosures due 3/2/2020. Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Discovery Motions due 5/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order Plaintiff to Defendant due by 7/1/2020, and Defendant to Court due by 7/15/2020. (smd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#16

(#16) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2019. (smd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Hathaway Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Rios, Linda) Modified security on 10/23/2019 (jjs). (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#13

(#13) Joint Status Report by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Filing of State Court Record (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JSR by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties shall file the JSR by 10/21/2019. (smd) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. The JSR is due 10/16/2019. (smd) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2019-01024. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT AND TELEPHONIC PRE-SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 1:00 PM. The parties are to call the AT&T Teleconference line: 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. The parties' settlement letters are due 2/6/2020, 2/13/2020, and 2/19/2020, as set forth in the attached order. (smd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call the AT&T Teleconference line: 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2019. Defendants' Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due 1/31/2020. Defendants' Expert Disclosures due 3/2/2020. Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Discovery Motions due 5/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order Plaintiff to Defendant due by 7/1/2020, and Defendant to Court due by 7/15/2020. (smd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2019. (smd) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adam Hathaway Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Rios, Linda) Modified security on 10/23/2019 (jjs). (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint Status Report by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Filing of State Court Record (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JSR by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties shall file the JSR by 10/21/2019. (smd) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • (#8) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 21 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. The JSR is due 10/16/2019. (smd) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (ln) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6680210 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2019-01024. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. (Simone, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.