This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:19 (UTC).

Hatfield v. Prudential Security, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Hatfield filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Prudential Security, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jack Zouhary and James G. Carr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02836

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jack Zouhary

James G. Carr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lotoria Hatfield

Defendant

Prudential Security, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Francis J. Landry

Attorney at Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg

1090 West South Boundary Street

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Katherine A. Pawlak

Attorney at Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg

1090 West South Boundary Street

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Defendant Attorney

Roy A. Hulme

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

6 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Prudential Security, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9664641.. Filed by Lotoria Hatfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B-Copy of Right to Sue

#4

(#4) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/6/2019. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge

#5

(#5) Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/9/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Lotoria Hatfield. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Landry, Francis) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Service by Waiver. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lotoria Hatfield. Prudential Security, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020 filed on behalf of Lotoria Hatfield (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Lotoria Hatfield. (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Prudential Security, Inc. (R,Ke) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lotoria Hatfield. Prudential Security, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020 filed on behalf of Lotoria Hatfield (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Prudential Security, Inc. (R,Ke) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Lotoria Hatfield. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Landry, Francis) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge James G. Carr assigned to case. Judge Jack Zouhary terminated. (M,L) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/9/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/6/2019. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Service by Waiver. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Lotoria Hatfield. (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Prudential Security, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9664641.. Filed by Lotoria Hatfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landry, Francis) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.